+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 138
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Melvin flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:23 pmobject
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: COM
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to COM - Forese
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Forese
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Melvin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Forese SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the COMMERCE Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Melvin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Forese SUBSTITUTE Floor Amendment to the COMMERCE Committee amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 23, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 18, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 5, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 4
January 23, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 23, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor