+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Final reading in House: Passed
On May 4, 2016 in the House:
- House concurred.
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On March 28, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Lesko flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
- FIN (ref Bill) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass amended.
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth - passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Banking and Financial Services Committee: do pass.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Banking and Financial Services Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (7)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Lesko flr amend (ref FIN) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Farnsworth - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (12)
May 5, 2016: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 56
May 5, 2016: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
March 28, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
March 28, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 3, 2016: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 5
March 3, 2016: Finance: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
March 1, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
March 1, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 25, 2016: Banking and Financial Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 25, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: House Banking and Financial Services Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 25, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2