+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Vetoed
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Driggs flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:55 pmobject
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Driggs flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 1, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
April 17, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
February 27, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 26, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor