+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:29 pm
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Transportation: Do pass
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
February 24, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 27, 2014: Transportation: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor