+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to COM - Forese
- Third read: Passed
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (9)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to COMMERCE Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 12, 2013: Public Safety: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 6, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor