+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 138
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:10 pm
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Judiciary: Do pass
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Judiciary
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:29 pm
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendment
3-6 jud
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2014: Judiciary: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
February 24, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2014: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor