+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 90
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 12, 2014 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Forese
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 3:29 pmobject
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
3-11 cem_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
3-10 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 26, 2014: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
February 25, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
January 27, 2014: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 27, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor