+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 4, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:39PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 30, 2019 in the House:
- House Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
February 25, 2019: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 11, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 4
January 28, 2019: House Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 28, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor