+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Floor Amend to APPROP - Thorpe - passed
- Amended by APPROP - passed as amended
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 19, 2018 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 8:55AM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 26, 2018: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 26, 2018: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 20, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 6
January 17, 2018: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 13
January 17, 2018: House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 17, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 6