+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 14, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:22PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- PS - Payne - passed
On February 12, 2019 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Committee of the Whole consent calendar at 5:22PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- House Public Safety Committee: do pass amended.
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 7, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 3
February 25, 2019: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 14, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 60
January 28, 2019: House Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 28, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8