+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held awaiting House action on Senate amendments
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Farley flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pmobject
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:27 pm
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Farley flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Farley flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 21, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 7
February 18, 2014: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 11, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 1
January 27, 2014: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 27, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor