+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On March 30, 2016 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 24, 2016 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:18PM.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Floor Amend to Bill - Cobb - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
Floor Amend to Bill - Cobb - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 24, 2016: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 29
March 24, 2016: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2016: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 11, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
February 11, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Absent: 1
January 21, 2016: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
January 21, 2016: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3