+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On June 7, 2019 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 27, 2019 in the House:
- Final reading in House: PASSED
- House concurred.
- House Minority Caucus.
- Conference committee recommended.
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- TPS (ref Bill) adopted
- Livingston flr amend (ref TPS) adopted
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On May 24, 2019 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: retained.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On March 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 28, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Floor Amend to PS - Payne - passed
- PS - passed as amended
On February 27, 2019 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: retained on calendar.
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2019 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On February 20, 2019 in the House:
- House Transportation Committee: do pass.
- House Public Safety Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On February 6, 2019 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to House Transportation Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
May 27, 2019: House Final Reading
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 29
May 24, 2019: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 7
March 6, 2019: Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
March 4, 2019: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 18
February 5, 2019: House Transportation Committee
- Yeas: 6
February 5, 2019: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
February 5, 2019: House Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 7