+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 137
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: ED
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Forese
- Third read: Passed
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Higher Education and Workforce Development: Withdrawn
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Education: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education and Workforce Development
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
House Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Education
House Adopted Amendment
3-27 ed_aspassedcommittee
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
April 16, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 10, 2014: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2014: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor