+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Ge
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Amendment: Motion to divide COM amendment passed by v/v
- Amendment: Sections 1, 2, 3 and 5 passed v/v
- Amendment: Section 4 - passed v/v
- Third read: Passed
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 4, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 6, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 1
February 6, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
February 6, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor