+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Finance Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Finance Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Objection to the consent calendar.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 6:05PM.
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- House Ways and Means Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2018 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Ways and Means Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (4)
February 20, 2018: Senate Finance Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
February 14, 2018: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
January 16, 2018: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 16, 2018: House Ways and Means Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (29)
Type:
Primary Sponsor