+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass amended
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: FI
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Financial Institutions: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Financial Institutions: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (12)
Financial Institutions
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Financial Institutions - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions
House Proposed Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Adopted Amendment
Appropriations
Senate Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Financial Institutions - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 10, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
March 10, 2014: Finance: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
March 5, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 2
February 5, 2014: Financial Institutions: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor