+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 72
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CEM (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref CEM)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to COM - Forese
- Third read: Passed
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (12)
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to COMMERCE Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to COMMERCE Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 8, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 2, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
March 4, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
February 6, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
February 6, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor