+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 136
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Melvin flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 1:15 pmobject
On March 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 13, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (6)
Melvin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Melvin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 16, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
April 15, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2014: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
February 18, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 2
January 28, 2014: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor