+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 137
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: PS (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref PS)
On March 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public Safety: Do pass amended
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: COM
- Amendment passed: RULES
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Forese
On February 20, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (14)
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Public Safety
Senate Proposed Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 24, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 4
April 22, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 3
March 4, 2013: Public Safety: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 4, 2013: Government and Environment: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
January 22, 2013: Rules: Amended constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2013: Commerce: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor