+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- Action: Vetoed
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CEM (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Ward flr amend (ref CEM) (sub McComish #1)
- Amendment withdrawn: McComish #2 flr amend (ref CEM)
- Amendment failed: Farley flr amend (ref CEM)
- Third read: Passed
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Forese
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:02 pmobject
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (13)
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ward flr amend (ref CEM) (sub McComish #1) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ward flr amend (ref CEM) (sub McComish #1) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
4-29 cem_asvetoed
Senate Fact Sheet
4-23 cem_aspassedcow
Senate Fact Sheet
3-24 cem_strikermemo_aspassedcommittee
Senate Fact Sheet
3-18 cem_strikermemo
Senate Fact Sheet
3-10 cem
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (6)
April 23, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 6
- Absent: 1
April 22, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2014: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
January 28, 2014: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor