+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 204
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 22, 2014 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 21, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: GE (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Griffin flr amend (ref GE)
On April 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass amended
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 24, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Forese
On February 17, 2014 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:54 pmobject
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Commerce: Do pass
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (15)
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref GE) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment
Senate Adopted Amendment
Forese Floor Amendment; Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Griffin flr amend (ref GE) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
3-3 ge-approp_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
4-21 ge-approp_cow_revised
Senate Fact Sheet
4-16 ge-approp_cow
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
April 21, 2014: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
April 17, 2014: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
February 25, 2014: Government and Environment: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2014: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2014: Commerce: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 28, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor