+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 27, 2008 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Higher Education
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On March 11, 2008 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 11, 2008 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: HSPR
On February 26, 2008 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2008 in the House:
- Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 11, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Homeland Security and Property Rights
On January 17, 2008 in the House:
- House second read
On January 16, 2008 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- House first read
+ − Amendments (4)
Homeland Security and Property Rights - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Homeland Security and Property Rights - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Homeland Security and Property Rights - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Homeland Security and Property Rights - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2008: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 26
February 11, 2008: Homeland Security and Property Rights: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
January 16, 2008: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor