+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 136
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- House concurrence
- House final read: Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: CEM (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref CEM)
- Amendment adopted: Melvin flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Commerce, Energy and Military
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:59 pm
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Withdrawn
On February 4, 2013 in the House:
- Financial Institutions: Do pass
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Financial Institutions
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (10)
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Melvin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Commerce, Energy and Military
Senate Proposed Amendment
Melvin flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (7)
April 22, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
April 18, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
February 21, 2013: Commerce, Energy and Military: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
February 21, 2013: Appropriations: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 9
February 19, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
January 22, 2013: Financial Institutions: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor