+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
- Final disposition: Held in committee of whole
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 11, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 6, 2013 in the House:
- Commerce: Withdrawn
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Commerce
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Government
House Adopted Amendment
Commerce
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
January 22, 2013: Government: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1