+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: failed to pass.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Health and Human Services Committee: do pass amended/strike-everything.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Health and Human Services Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- HEALTH - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- House Health Committee: do pass amended.
On February 8, 2017 in the House:
- House Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Health Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Appropriations Committee.
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 4
February 28, 2017: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 23, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 1
January 18, 2017: House Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
January 18, 2017: House Health Committee
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
January 18, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor