+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: TI
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 2, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 12, 2009 in the House:
- Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Transportation and Infrastructure
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Transportation and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
January 22, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 2
January 22, 2009: Transportation and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8