+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 121
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Final disposition: None
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 18, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 27, 2007 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
- Consent calendar: 11:55 amobject
On March 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Health: Do pass
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
On February 19, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: HEALTH
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to HEALTH - Stump
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Health: Do pass amended (corrected)
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (5)
Stump Substitute Floor Amendment to the Health Committee Amendment, Reference to printed Bill
House Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
Health
House Adopted Amendment
2-27 health
Senate Fact Sheet
Stump Substitute Floor Amendment to the Health Committee Amendment, Reference to printed Bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
April 18, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
February 21, 2007: Health: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 19, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
January 18, 2007: Health: Do pass amended (corrected) (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 3
January 18, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor