+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: PASSED
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:30PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- First read in Senate.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Third read in House: PASSED
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- Objection to the consent calendar.
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 2:10PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
March 23, 2022: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 7
February 17, 2022: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
February 15, 2022: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 12
January 24, 2022: House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4
January 24, 2022: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor