+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 25, 2015 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in committee of whole
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:03 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- House first read
+ − Votes (2)
January 22, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 22, 2015: Ways and Means: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor