+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 8, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: do pass.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Appropriations Committee: do pass.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
- Referred to Senate Appropriations Committee.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 13, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 9, 2017 in the House:
- LARA - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 7, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 6, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 19, 2017 in the House:
- House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee: do pass amended.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
May 4, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 2
February 20, 2017: Senate Appropriations Committee
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
February 20, 2017: Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 13, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 18
January 17, 2017: House Land, Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor