+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government Institutions
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On May 28, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On May 28, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: GOV
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 24, 2009 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike everything on reconsideration
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Government
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 4
January 20, 2009: Government: Do pass amended/strike everything on reconsideration (House)
- Yeas: 9
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor