+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Finance
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 9, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 16, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 1:30 pm
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Appropriations: Do pass
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On January 21, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 20, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Appropriations
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (4)
June 9, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 2
January 20, 2009: Appropriations: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
January 20, 2009: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 20, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1