+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:10PM.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:58PM.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 3
February 20, 2017: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 2, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2017: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor