+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- Final disposition: Failed in House on final passage
- House final read: Failed
- House concurrence
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Ward flr amend (ref ED)
- Amendment adopted: ED (ref Bill)
- Amendment adopted: Bradley flr amend (ref Bill)
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Education
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Representative mitchell moved that the House reconsider hb2250 immediately. motion passed by v/v
- Motion
- 0 0 0 0
- Motion to reconsider: Date ayes nays nv exc vac
- Vote detail 35 24 1 0 y passed
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Mitchell
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 26, 2015 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 24, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2015 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ward flr amend (ref ED) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Bradley flr amend (ref Bill) adopted
Senate Adopted Amendment
Floor Amend to Bill - Mitchell - passed
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 3, 2015: House final read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 4
March 30, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
March 12, 2015: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
March 10, 2015: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 31
January 22, 2015: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor