+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On April 14, 2010 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On April 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Finance
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment: WM - passed as amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to WM - McComish
- Amendment failed: Floor Amend to Bill - Chabin
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - McComish
- Third read: Passed
On January 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Do pass amended
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
On January 14, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (11)
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
McComish Floor amendment, reference to the Ways and Means Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
McComish Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Finance
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Ways and Means
House Adopted Amendment
McComish Floor amendment, reference to the Ways and Means Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Finance - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
April 1, 2010: Finance: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 28, 2010: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1
January 14, 2010: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 3
January 14, 2010: Ways and Means: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (38)
Type:
Primary Sponsor