+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 22, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senator Allen moved that the Senate reconsider its action whereby it failed to pass HB 2249 on Third Reading on May 8, 2017. Motion carried.
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Failed
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:10PM.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Transportation and Technology Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Transportation and Technology Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 2, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:58PM.
On January 25, 2017 in the House:
- House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee: do pass.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Votes (5)
May 9, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 10
February 20, 2017: Senate Transportation and Technology Committee
- Yeas: 7
February 2, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 59
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2017: House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor