+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (43)
On June 13, 2007 in the House:
- Final disposition: None
- Action: Signed
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 246
On June 11, 2007 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On May 23, 2007 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On May 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On May 22, 2007 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On May 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment adopted: Leff flr amend (ref Bill)
On April 17, 2007 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On April 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Consent calendar: 12:57 pmobject
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On April 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Commerce and Economic Development: Withdrawn
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass
On February 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 21, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Public Safety and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Commerce and Economic Development
On February 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 20, 2007 in the House:
- Representative tom moved that the House reconsider hb 2249 immediately. motion passed by v/v.
- Motion
- Vote detail 31 26 3 0 y passed
On February 19, 2007 in the House:
- Third read: Failed
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Amendment passed: Sub Floor Amend to HS - Hershberger
- Amendment: HS
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 13, 2007 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Human Services: Do pass amended
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Transportation: Withdrawn
On January 22, 2007 in the House:
- House second read
On January 18, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Transportation
- Assigned to committee: Human Services
- House first read
+ − Amendments (8)
Leff Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Hershberger Substitute Floor Amendment to the Human Services Committee Amendment, Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Leff Floor Amendment, reference to House engrossed bill
Senate Adopted Amendment
Human Services
House Adopted Amendment
Hershberger Substitute Floor Amendment to the Human Services Committee Amendment, Reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
5-23 as passed senate
Senate Fact Sheet
3-19 pshs-ced
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (7)
June 11, 2007: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 8
May 22, 2007: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 7
February 21, 2007: Public Safety and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
February 20, 2007: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 3
February 19, 2007: Third read: failed (House)
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 5
January 18, 2007: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
January 18, 2007: Human Services: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 9
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor