+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 10, 2017 in the House:
- Governor Action: Signed
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Governor.
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Transmit to House.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third read in Senate: Passed
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Majority Caucus: Yes
- Senate Minority Caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 1:09PM.
- Senate Rules Committee: proper for consideration.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Judiciary Committee: do pass.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On January 30, 2017 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On January 24, 2017 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On January 23, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 5:07PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 18, 2017 in the House:
- Second read in House.
- House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee: do pass.
On January 17, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (5)
April 3, 2017: Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 30
February 20, 2017: Senate Judiciary Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 30, 2017: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
January 17, 2017: House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee
- Yeas: 9
January 17, 2017: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor