+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 50
- Action: Signed
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Concurrence recommended
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Transmit to House
On April 5, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: RULES (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 29, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration amended
On March 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Government Reform: Do pass
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government Reform
- Senate first read
On March 4, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 3, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: TI
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 1, 2011 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 24, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 23, 2011 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 17, 2011 in the House:
- Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On February 16, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On February 15, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Technology and Infrastructure
- House first read
+ − Amendments (7)
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Rules
Senate Adopted Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
3-14 gr
Senate Fact Sheet
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 7, 2011: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 3
April 5, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 2
March 7, 2011: Government Reform: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
March 3, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
February 15, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
February 15, 2011: Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor