+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Held
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
- Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Senate first read
On March 11, 2013 in the House:
- Amendment passed: TI
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Third read: Passed
On March 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 31, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
- Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 30, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Technology and Infrastructure
- House first read
+ − Amendments (6)
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Technology and Infrastructure - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
March 11, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 30, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 30, 2013: Technology and Infrastructure: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor