+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on the consent calendar at 4:43PM.
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- House Government and Higher Education Committee: do pass.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
- Referred to House Government and Higher Education Committee.
- First read in House.
+ − Votes (4)
January 21, 2016: Government and Higher Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Absent: 3
January 21, 2016: House Government and Higher Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor