+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Nrra
- Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
- Consent calendar: 2:54 pm
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Agriculture and Water: Do pass
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Agriculture and Water
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Votes (3)
February 18, 2014: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 9
January 22, 2014: Agriculture and Water: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 8
January 22, 2014: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor