+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On March 29, 2010 in the House:
- Rules: Held
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Ways and Means: Withdrawn
On January 28, 2010 in the House:
- Water and Energy: Do pass amended
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- House second read
- Final disposition: Held in rules
On January 19, 2010 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Water and Energy
- Assigned to committee: Ways and Means
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (2)
Water and Energy
House Adopted Amendment
Water and Energy
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Vote
January 19, 2010: Water and Energy: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor