+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Final disposition: Held in committee of whole
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 25, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:14 pmobject
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Insurance and Retirement: Do pass
On January 24, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Insurance and Retirement
- House first read
+ − Votes (2)
January 23, 2013: Insurance and Retirement: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
January 23, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor