+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Chapter: 263
- Action: Signed
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 23, 2015 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 16, 2015 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 3:03 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 10, 2015 in the House:
- Health: Do pass
On January 26, 2015 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Health
- House first read
+ − Votes (5)
April 2, 2015: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
February 24, 2015: Health and Human Services: Do pass (Senate)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 3
February 23, 2015: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
January 22, 2015: Health: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
January 22, 2015: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9