+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On June 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On June 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Final disposition: Held in Senate
On June 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On June 22, 2009 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On June 18, 2009 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Seel #1
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to Bill - Seel #2
On March 24, 2009 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
On March 23, 2009 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Health and Human Services: Do pass
On January 26, 2009 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2009 in the House:
- House first read
- Assigned to committee: Health and Human Services
- Assigned to committee: Rules
+ − Amendments (4)
Seel floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Seel Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Seel Floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
Seel floor amendment, reference to printed bill
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
June 22, 2009: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 4
January 22, 2009: Health and Human Services: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
January 22, 2009: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor