+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 12, 2011 in the House:
- Chaptered version: House engrossed version
- Action: Signed
- Chapter: 49
On April 7, 2011 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 6, 2011 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 6, 2011 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On March 22, 2011 in the Senate:
- Amendment withdrawn: ED (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass
On March 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On February 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Education: Do pass amended
On February 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On February 16, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senate first read
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
On February 8, 2011 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
On February 1, 2011 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Consent calendar: 2:23 pm
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On January 24, 2011 in the House:
- Education: Do pass
On January 20, 2011 in the House:
- House second read
On January 19, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Education
- House first read
+ − Amendments (5)
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
Education
Senate Adopted Amendment
Education
Senate Proposed Amendment
4-8 ed_aspassed
Senate Fact Sheet
+ − Votes (5)
April 6, 2011: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
February 16, 2011: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 1
February 8, 2011: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
January 19, 2011: Education: Do pass (House)
- Yeas: 10
January 19, 2011: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor