+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On April 29, 2013 in the House:
- Chaptered version: Senate engrossed version
- Chapter: 133
- Action: Signed
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Transmitted to: Governor
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- House final read: Passed
- House concurrence
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Majority caucus: Yes
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Concurrence recommended
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- Transmit to House
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third read: Passed
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Amendment adopted: GE (ref Bill)
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On March 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules: Proper for consideration
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Government and Environment: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate second read
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government and Environment
- Senate first read
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Third read: Passed
- Amendment passed: Floor Amend to GOV - Stevens
- Amendment passed: GOV
- Committee of the Whole: Do pass amended
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Committee of the Whole: Retained on the Calendar
On February 19, 2013 in the House:
- Minority caucus: Yes
- Majority caucus: Yes
On February 18, 2013 in the House:
- Rules: Constitutional and in proper form
On February 5, 2013 in the House:
- Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything
On January 23, 2013 in the House:
- House second read
On January 22, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to committee: Rules
- Assigned to committee: Government
- House first read
+ − Amendments (10)
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Stevens Floor Amendment; Reference to GOVERNMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Proposed Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Proposed Amendment
Government and Environment - Strike Everything
Senate Adopted Amendment
Government - Strike Everything
House Adopted Amendment
Stevens Floor Amendment; Reference to GOVERNMENT Committee amendment
House Adopted Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
April 17, 2013: House final read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 1
April 11, 2013: Third read: passed (Senate)
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 3
March 4, 2013: Government and Environment: Do pass amended/strike-everything (Senate)
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
February 28, 2013: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 56
- Present/NV: 4
January 22, 2013: Government: Do pass amended/strike-everything (House)
- Yeas: 8
- Absent: 1
January 22, 2013: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 9