+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Education Committee: do pass amended.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read in Senate.
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- First read in Senate.
- Referred to Senate Education Committee.
- Referred to Senate Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Transmit to Senate.
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Third read in House: Passed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- ED - passed
- Committee of the Whole: do pass amended.
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- House Majority Caucus: Yes
- House Minority Caucus: Yes
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- House Rules Committee: constitutional and in proper form.
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- House Education Committee: do pass amended.
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Second read in House.
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- First read in House.
- Referred to House Education Committee.
- Referred to House Rules Committee.
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (8)
February 18, 2016: Senate Education Committee
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 18, 2016: Education: Do pass amended (Senate)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
February 17, 2016: Third read: passed (House)
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 15
February 17, 2016: House Third Reading
- Yeas: 45
- Nays: 15
January 21, 2016: Education: Do pass amended (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 1
January 21, 2016: Rules: Constitutional and in proper form (House)
- Yeas: 7
- Absent: 2
January 21, 2016: House Education Committee
- Yeas: 7
January 21, 2016: House Rules Committee
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor